Competition | Stage | P | W | D | L | Penalties | F | A | Win % | SR% | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Won | Lost | ||||||||||
All matches | 2 | 0 | 1 | 1 | 0 | 0 | 1 | 2 | 0.00% | 25.00% | |
English Football League | 2 | 0 | 1 | 1 | 0 | 0 | 1 | 2 | 0.00% | 25.00% |
Club | Details |
---|---|
Bolton Wanderers
Bolton |
July 1974 (signed professional contract); transferred out (August 1981) |
Everton
Everton |
August 1981 (transferred in, exchange , £90,000 plus Jim McDonagh) |
Norwich City
Norwich City |
October 1982 (loan) |
Burnley
Burnley |
December 1982 (loan) |
Fort Lauderdale Strikers
Fort Lauderdale Strikers |
cs 1983 |
Manchester City
Man City |
October 1983 |
Blackpool
Blackpool |
February 1984 |
Bury
Bury |
July 1989 (player-coach)
December 11th, 1990 (manager) |
Barrow
Barrow |
May 1996 (manager) |
Swindon Town
Swindon |
October 1996 (appointed assistant manager); sacked (rptd January 4th, 2000)
September 23rd, 1998 (caretaker manager) |
Sunderland
Sunderland |
July 2000 (chief scout) |
Southport
Southport |
rptd January 29th, 2003 (appointed manager); sacked (rptd September 29th, 2003) |
Swindon Town
Swindon |
rptd July 5th, 2004 (appointed assistant manager); retired (January 2005) |