Club | Details |
---|---|
Australian Institute of Sport
Australian Institute of Sport |
1986 |
Blacktown City
Blacktown City |
1987 |
APIA Leichhardt
APIA |
1989 |
Sint-Truiden
Sint-Truiden |
1990 |
APIA Leichhardt
APIA |
1991 |
St. George
St. George |
1992 |
Go Ahead Eagles
Go Ahead Eagles |
cs 1992 ; transferred out (September 8th, 1994) |
Millwall
Millwall |
September 8th, 1994 (transferred in , £300,000 ); transferred out (August 9th, 1997) |
Manchester City
Man City |
August 9th, 1997 (transferred in , £200,000 ) |
West Bromwich Albion
West Bromwich Albion |
March 13th, 1998 (transferred in , £250,000 ); released (2000/1) |
Swindon Town
Swindon |
July 20th, 2001 (trial) |
Stockport County
Stockport County |
August 16th, 2001 (unattached); released (rptd November 13th, 2001) |
Wrexham
Wrexham |
December 10th, 2001 (non-contract) |
Hull City
Hull City |
January 3rd, 2002 (unattached); released (2001/2) |
Shrewsbury Town
Shrewsbury Town |
August 8th, 2002 (unattached) |
KFC Dessel Sport
Dessel |
cs 2003 |
Altrincham
Altrincham |
rptd September 19th, 2003 (non-contract) |
Colwyn Bay
Colwyn Bay |
rptd October 24th, 2003 |
Wollongong Wolves
Wollongong Wolves |
rptd December 8th, 2003 |
Macclesfield Town
Macclesfield |
March 25th, 2004 (non-contract) |
Mossley
Mossley |
July 2004 (trial) |
Northwich Victoria
Northwich Victoria |
December 2004 (trial) |
Colwyn Bay
Colwyn Bay |
rptd December 24th, 2004 |
Runcorn FC Halton
Runcorn FC Halton |
rptd March 31st, 2005 |
APIA Leichhardt Tigers
APIA |
cs 2006 |
GHFA Spirit
GHFA Spirit |
rptd November 18th, 2008 (head coach) |
Central Coast Mariners
Central Coast Mariners |
rptd October 24th, 2013 (academy head coach) |
Southern and Ettalong United
Southern & Ettalong United |
2021 (junior technical director) |