Club | Details |
---|---|
Leeds United
Leeds United |
(trainee)
August 4th, 2000 (signed professional contract); released (2002/3) |
Swindon Town
Swindon |
January 27th, 2003 (trial) |
Cambridge United
Cambridge United |
February 14th, 2003 (loan); expired (rptd March 17th, 2003) |
Darlington
Darlington |
March 27th, 2003 (loan); expired (2002/3) |
Leyton Orient
Leyton Orient |
August 8th, 2003 (unattached); transferred out (March 11th, 2005) |
Cambridge United
Cambridge United |
January 21st, 2005 (loan) |
Cambridge United
Cambridge United |
March 11th, 2005 (transferred in, free transfer); released (2004/5) |
Grimsby Town
Grimsby Town |
July 28th, 2005 (unattached) |
Rochdale
Rochdale |
March 25th, 2009 (loan); expired (2008/9) |
Bury
Bury |
August 28th, 2009 (unattached); released (2009/0) |
Rotherham United
Rotherham United |
July 1st, 2010 (unattached); released (rptd May 7th, 2012) |
Scunthorpe United
Scunthorpe United |
August 13th, 2012 (unattached); released (rptd May 31st, 2013) |
Oxford United
Oxford United |
July 4th, 2013 (unattached); released (January 26th, 2015) |
Northampton Town
Northampton Town |
October 30th, 2014 (loan); expired (rptd January 3rd, 2015) |
Northampton Town
Northampton Town |
rptd January 27th, 2015 |
Rotherham United
Rotherham United |
2017 (academy coach) |
Leeds United
Leeds United |
2017 (youth coach) |