Club | Details |
---|---|
Watford
Watford |
(trainee)
February 7th, 1987 (signed professional contract); transferred out (July 18th, 1989) |
Norwich City
Norwich City |
July 18th, 1989 (transferred in , £325,000 ); transferred out (February 12th, 1992) |
Blackburn Rovers
Blackburn |
February 12th, 1992 (transferred in , £325,000 ); transferred out (February 5th, 1999) |
Tottenham Hotspur
Tottenham |
February 5th, 1999 (transferred in , £3,000,000 ); transferred out (January 29th, 2003) |
Portsmouth
Portsmouth |
January 29th, 2003 (transferred in, free transfer); released (2003/4) |
Coventry City
Coventry City |
August 3rd, 2004 (unattached); released (rptd July 1st, 2005) |
Tottenham Hotspur
Tottenham |
rptd October 31st, 2008 (appointed assistant coach)
2012 (appointed technical director) December 16th, 2013 (appointed caretaker manager) December 23rd, 2013 (appointed manager); sacked (May 13th, 2014) |
Aston Villa
Aston Villa |
February 16th, 2015 (appointed manager); sacked (October 25th, 2015) |
Swindon Town
Swindon |
rptd November 10th, 2016 (appointed director of football); resigned (rptd June 14th, 2017) |